MN HF2945 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Intensive residential treatment and adult crisis response service provider entity requirements modified.
Title
Intensive residential treatment and adult crisis response service provider entity requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Roz Peterson [R] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] |
Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 151 | |
2018-05-19 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-19 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-14 | House | Returned from Senate |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2545 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2545, now on General Orders |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-07 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 126-0 |
2018-05-07 | House | Third reading as amended |
2018-05-07 | House | Amended |
2018-05-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 07, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Franke. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2545 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2945