MN SF2544 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Student loan counseling program requirement provisions modifications
Title
Student loan counseling program requirement provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Clausen [D] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Sen. Terri Bonoff [D] |
Sen. David Tomassoni [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3090 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 26, 2016