MN SF2490 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 223 05/09/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Secretary of State Chapter 223 05/09/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public employment joint powers agreement employee protections authorization
Title
Public employment joint powers agreement employee protections authorization
Sponsors
Sen. David Tomassoni [I] | Sen. Kevin Dahle [D] | Sen. Chris Eaton [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] |
Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Rep. Tom Anzelc [D] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Carly Melin [D] |
Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Mary Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - House - House: Passage (Y: 77 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 54 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 54 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 55 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 54 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 54 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 55 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Secretary of State Chapter 223 05/09/14 | |
2014-05-12 | Governor's action Approval 05/09/14 | |
2014-05-09 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-09 | Governor approval | |
2014-05-07 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Returned from House |
2014-05-06 | House | Bill was passed vote: 77-49 |
2014-05-06 | House | Third reading |
2014-05-06 | House | Amendments offered |
2014-05-02 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 6, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Second reading |
2014-05-01 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2939 |
2014-04-30 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 39-23 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |