MN SF2466 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vulnerable adults financial exploitation provisions modifications
Title
Vulnerable adults financial exploitation provisions modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 126 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-16 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 85 | |
2020-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Returned from House |
2020-05-13 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-13 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 13, 2020 |
2020-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-09 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-07 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with HF2475 |
2020-05-04 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-05-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2475 (Similar To) 2020-05-09 - Author added Bernardy