MN HF2475 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-09 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-09 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vulnerable adult financial exploitation protection provisions modified.
Title
Vulnerable adult financial exploitation protection provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2020-05-09 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2020-05-09 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-07 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2466 |
2020-05-05 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-04-30 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-04-30 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-03-26 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2020-03-12 | House | Authors added Lislegard and Dettmer |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Sandell |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2466 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State, Filed