MN SF2459 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children's advocacy center membership on multidisciplinary child protection teams
Title
Children's advocacy center membership on multidisciplinary child protection teams
Sponsors
Sen. Vicki Jensen [D] | Sen. Kathleen Sheran [D] | Sen. Tom Saxhaug [D] | Sen. John Pederson [R] |
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Second reading |
2016-04-28 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-04-27 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 2572 |
2016-04-27 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Special Order |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2572 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - HF indefinitely postponed