MN SF2388 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF3108
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF3108
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections provisions modifications; representative in Congress vacancy provision; election postponement due to inclement weather
Title
Elections provisions modifications; representative in Congress vacancy provision; election postponement due to inclement weather
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bonoff [D] | Sen. Chris Gerlach [R] | Sen. Linda Higgins [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
Sen. Katie Sieben [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF3108 | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Referred to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight |