MN SF212 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-20 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-20 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Boiler regulation exception modification
Title
Boiler regulation exception modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2009-02-20 | Governor approval | |
2009-02-19 | Senate: Returned from House | |
2009-02-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-02-17 | Presentment date | |
2009-02-16 | House: Bill was passed | |
2009-02-16 | House: Third reading | |
2009-02-16 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-02-12 | House: Second reading | |
2009-02-12 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register | |
2009-02-09 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF329 | |
2009-02-09 | House: Received from Senate | |
2009-02-05 | Senate: Consent Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-02-02 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-02-02 | Senate: Comm report: To pass, Consent Calendar | |
2009-01-26 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Business, Industry and Jobs |