MN SF1995 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Farmed Cervidae requirements modification and chronic wasting disease test development appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Farmed Cervidae requirements modification and chronic wasting disease test development appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2019-03-26SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
2019-03-11SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance
2019-03-07SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy
2019-03-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback