MN SF1933 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wage theft prohibition; wage payment modification; civil and criminal penalties increase; administrative review; appropriation
Title
Wage theft prohibition; wage payment modification; civil and criminal penalties increase; administrative review; appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF6 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Second reading