MN HF6 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Wage theft prohibited, wage payment modified, civil and criminal penalties increased, administrative review allowed, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wage theft prohibited, wage payment modified, civil and criminal penalties increased, administrative review allowed, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseSecond reading
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-04-03HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion did not prevail State Government Finance Division
2019-03-26HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-08HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-03-05HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-01-14HouseAuthor added Youakim
2019-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Labor

Same As/Similar To

SF1933 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Author added Marty

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback