MN SF193 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Psychology interjurisdictional compact (PSYPACT) creation
Title
Psychology interjurisdictional compact (PSYPACT) creation
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - House: S.F. NO. 193 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-05-25 | Governor approval | |
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 27 | |
2021-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-05-17 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2021-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2021-05-17 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2021-05-17 | House | Conference committee report |
2021-05-17 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third reading |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2021-05-15 | Senate | House conferees Morrison; Moller; Rasmusson |
2021-05-14 | House | House conferees Morrison, Moller, Rasmusson |
2021-05-13 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate conferees Benson; Draheim; Wiklund |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate conferees Benson; Draheim; Wiklund |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2021-04-29 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Amended |
2021-04-27 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-04-21 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF269 |
2021-04-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Authors added Draheim; Wiklund; Koran; Rosen |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF269 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Author added Frazier