MN SF1889 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Senate file first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Senate file first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Trunk highway rights-of-way mow or hay permits moratorium establishment
Title
Trunk highway rights-of-way mow or hay permits moratorium establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Bill Weber [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-05-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Author added Frentz |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1984 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division