MN SF1888 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community energy transition competitive grant program establishment and appropriation
Title
Community energy transition competitive grant program establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1919 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Author added Layman