MN HF1919 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Author added Layman
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Author added Layman
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community energy transition competitive grant program created, money transferred, advisory council created, and report required.
Title
Community energy transition competitive grant program created, money transferred, advisory council created, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Shane Mekeland [R] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] |
Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Layman |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Miller |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1888 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance