MN SF1883 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Career and technical education equipment grants establishment and appropriation
Title
Career and technical education equipment grants establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1897 (Similar To) 2015-04-16 - Author added Norton.