MN HF1897 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-16 - Author added Norton.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-16 - Author added Norton.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Career and technical education need grant programs established, and money appropriated.
Title
Career and technical education need grant programs established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Author added Norton. |
2015-03-18 | House | Author added Kahn. |
2015-03-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1883 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Author added Nelson