MN SF1839 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Author added Champion
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Safe harbor shelter and housing grant program creation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe harbor shelter and housing grant program creation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06SenateAuthor added Champion
2023-02-27SenateAuthor added Mitchell
2023-02-20SenateReferred to Health and Human Services
2023-02-20SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1858 (Similar To) 2023-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback