MN SF1805 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Senate file first reading, referred to Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Senate file first reading, referred to Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lawn care equipment operation by 16 and 17 year olds authorization
Title
Lawn care equipment operation by 16 and 17 year olds authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hall [R] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] | Sen. Karla Bigham [D] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
Sen. Mark Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Government Operations |
2020-05-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Author added Johnson |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Author stricken Cwodzinski |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF790 (Similar To) 2020-05-12 - Author added Boe