MN SF1552 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
City charter commission expenses payment authorization
Title
City charter commission expenses payment authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1513 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Second reading