MN SF1502 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student Loan Borrower Bill of Rights
Title
Student Loan Borrower Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. David Tomassoni [I] | Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Author added Franzen |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1493 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means