MN HF1493 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Student loan servicers licensure required, certain student loan servicing practices prohibited, and money appropriated.
Title
Student loan servicers licensure required, certain student loan servicing practices prohibited, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1502 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy