MN SF1367 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1440, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Family homeless prevention and assistance program appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family homeless prevention and assistance program appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenateRule 45; subst. General Orders HF1440, SF indefinitely postponed
2023-03-13SenateSecond reading
2023-03-13SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2023-03-01SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2023-02-09SenateAuthor added Mitchell
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Housing and Homelessness Prevention
2023-02-08SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1440 (Similar To) 2023-03-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 20

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback