MN HF1440 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Family homeless prevention and assistance program funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Family homeless prevention and assistance program funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 73 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 73 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Secretary of State Chapter 20 | |
2023-03-30 | Governor's action Approval | |
2023-03-30 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2023-03-30 | Governor approval | |
2023-03-30 | Presented to Governor | |
2023-03-27 | House | Returned from Senate |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Special Order |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1367 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1367, now on General Orders |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-03-16 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2023-03-16 | House | Third reading as amended |
2023-03-16 | House | Amended |
2023-03-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 16, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Second reading |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-02-13 | House | Author added Kraft |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1367 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1440, SF indefinitely postponed