MN SF1252 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State high school league governing board membership modification
Title
State high school league governing board membership modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass, Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2246 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy