MN SF1227 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Draheim
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Draheim
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Separate licensure for medical gas distributors establishment; opiate registration fee exemptions for certain opiate manufacturers authorization; opiate epidemic response advisory council role in reporting to the legislature and determining grant awards and amounts clarification; term limits for advisory council members establishment; medical gases manufacturers and wholesalers license fee reduction
Title
Separate licensure for medical gas distributors establishment; opiate registration fee exemptions for certain opiate manufacturers authorization; opiate epidemic response advisory council role in reporting to the legislature and determining grant awards and amounts clarification; term limits for advisory council members establishment; medical gases manufacturers and wholesalers license fee reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1399 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Author added Heintzeman