MN SF12 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Unlimited social security income tax subtraction authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlimited social security income tax subtraction authorization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders (Y: 32 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30SenateMotion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders
2023-01-11SenateAuthor added Pratt
2023-01-05SenateAuthors added Dahms; Abeler; Hoffman
2023-01-04SenateReferred to Taxes
2023-01-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1448 (Similar To) 2023-02-09 - Author added Petersburg

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback