MN SF1190 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Credit unions meetings notification requirement modification
Title
Credit unions meetings notification requirement modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1477 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1477 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 25 05/02/17