MN SF11 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic monitoring in nursing facilities and assisted living facilities requirements establishment
Title
Electronic monitoring in nursing facilities and assisted living facilities requirements establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Authors added Rest; Relph; Abeler; Eken |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Family Care and Aging |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF146 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Author added Drazkowski