MN SF1078 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Human services and health care systems welfare system mental health data sharing authorization
Title
Human services and health care systems welfare system mental health data sharing authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1155 (Similar To) 2015-04-13 - Motion prevailed