MN SF1063 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exemption provision for fiber and conduit used in broadband and Internet access services
Title
Exemption provision for fiber and conduit used in broadband and Internet access services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Authors added Putnam; Weber |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1793 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes