MN HF977 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Low-income student college admission and graduation programs funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Low-income student college admission and graduation programs funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2024 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy