MN HF976 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus environment, natural resources, and agriculture finance and policy bill.
Title
Omnibus environment, natural resources, and agriculture finance and policy bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] |
Sen. David Tomassoni [I] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-18 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 71 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-18 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 73 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 66 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-18 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 73 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 66 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Secretary of State Chapter 114 | |
2013-05-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Third reading vote: 42-23 |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2013-05-18 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2013-05-18 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 42-23 |
2013-05-18 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 71-60 |
2013-05-18 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2013-05-18 | House | House adopted conference committee report vote: 73-59 |
2013-05-18 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate conferees Tomassoni; Saxhaug; Sparks; Metzen; Westrom |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | House conferees Wagenius; Dill; Poppe; Hansen; Falk |
2013-04-23 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2013-04-23 | House | Senate conferees Tomassoni, Saxhaug, Sparks, Metzen and Westrom |
2013-04-23 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2013-04-22 | House | House conferees Wagenius, Dill, Poppe, Hansen, and Falk |
2013-04-22 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 38-27 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Taken from table |
2013-04-20 | Senate | Laid on table |
2013-04-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-20 | Senate | Taken from table |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Laid on table |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 69-61 |
2013-04-18 | House | Third reading as amended |
2013-04-18 | House | Amended |
2013-04-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 18th, 2013 |
2013-04-15 | House | Author added Poppe |
2013-04-15 | House | Second reading |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |