MN HF965 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Jurgens
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Jurgens
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Special education recovery services and support plans required for students with disabilities, federal fund appropriation replacement provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Special education recovery services and support plans required for students with disabilities, federal fund appropriation replacement provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Christensen |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-02-18 | House | Authors added Bierman and Huot |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1210 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy