MN HF961 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supervisory law enforcement unit added.
Title
Supervisory law enforcement unit added.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] |
Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House: H.F. NO. 961 (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House: H.F. NO. 961 (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 80 | |
2022-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Third reading |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2022-05-20 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2022-05-20 | House | Returned from Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2022-05-19 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2022-05-19 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2022-05-19 | House | Motion prevailed |
2022-05-19 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2022-05-19 | House | Conference committee report |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Howe; Duckworth; Dziedzic |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | House conferees Ecklund; Greenman; Novotny |
2022-05-18 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2022-05-18 | House | Senate conferees Howe; Duckworth; Dziedzic |
2022-05-18 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2022-05-17 | House | House conferees Ecklund, Greenman, Novotny |
2022-05-16 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2022-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1040 |
2022-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1040, now on General Orders |
2022-04-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-04-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-04-24 | House | Author added Edelson |
2022-04-21 | House | Bill was passed |
2022-04-21 | House | Third reading |
2022-04-19 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 21, 2022 |
2022-04-07 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-02-03 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1040 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF961