MN SF1040 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF961
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State employees additional supervisory law enforcement unit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employees additional supervisory law enforcement unit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-25SenateRule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF961
2022-03-24SenateSecond reading
2022-03-24SenateComm report: To pass
2021-04-07SenateAuthors added Gazelka; Ingebrigtsen; Housley
2021-02-25SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
2021-02-15SenateReferred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2021-02-15SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF961 (Similar To) 2022-05-20 - Third reading vote: 66-0

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback