MN HF947 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-16 - Author added Morrison
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-16 - Author added Morrison
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Delinquent children and youth in detention facility visual inspection prohibited, delinquent children and youth in detention facility disciplinary room time prohibited, and delinquency and detention age raised to 13 years old.
Title
Delinquent children and youth in detention facility visual inspection prohibited, delinquent children and youth in detention facility disciplinary room time prohibited, and delinquency and detention age raised to 13 years old.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Author added Morrison |
2021-03-11 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-03-10 | House | Authors added Boldon, Berg and Hanson, J. |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Gomez |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Frazier, Mueller, Poston and Xiong, J. |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Moller and Long |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Novotny |
2021-02-18 | House | Author added Ecklund, Hollins, Mariani, and Noor |
2021-02-15 | House | Authors added Edelson, Klevorn, Keeler, Feist and Huot |
2021-02-15 | House | Author stricken Miller |
2021-02-11 | House | Author added Miller |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF951 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Author added Marty