MN HF928 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Gomez
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fetal alcohol spectrum disorder reduction programs funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Fetal alcohol spectrum disorder reduction programs funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Gomez |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1530 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy