MN HF912 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Layla Jackson Law established, child welfare provisions modified, African American Child Well-Being Advisory Council established, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Layla Jackson Law established, child welfare provisions modified, African American Child Well-Being Advisory Council established, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2024-04-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-04-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2024-04-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-02-29 | House | Author added PĂ©rez-Vega |
2024-02-26 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2024-02-22 | House | Author added Xiong |
2024-02-19 | House | Author added Kozlowski |
2024-02-14 | House | Author added Fischer |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Vang |
2023-02-15 | House | Author added Reyer |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Children and Families Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF716 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance