MN HF896 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance
Pending: House Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance
Pending: House Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electric fish barrier design contract required.
Title
Electric fish barrier design contract required.
Sponsors
Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Mark Uglem [R] | Rep. Dennis McNamara [R] | Rep. David Dill [D] |
Rep. Tom Hackbarth [R] | Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance |
2013-03-04 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-04 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-02-28 | House | Authors added Isaacson and Fabian |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |