MN HF894 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Haley
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Wind energy siting noise complains process to address created.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wind energy siting noise complains process to address created.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Haley
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Bennett
2019-02-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF848 (Similar To) 2019-02-04 - Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback