MN HF884 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Christensen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Christensen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce and affordable homeownership development program qualified entities to participate in and funding types available expanded, workforce and affordable homeownership account created in housing development fund, and money appropriated.
Title
Workforce and affordable homeownership development program qualified entities to participate in and funding types available expanded, workforce and affordable homeownership account created in housing development fund, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Christensen |
2019-03-13 | House | Authors added Richardson; Mann; Xiong, J.; Xiong, T.; Vang; and Noor |
2019-03-11 | House | Authors added Mahoney and Lillie |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Demuth |
2019-02-27 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Lee and Bierman |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Lueck |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF942 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes