MN HF866 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Youakim
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Youakim
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income subtraction from public pension plans provided.
Title
Income subtraction from public pension plans provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] |
Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Author added Youakim |
2019-04-04 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Schultz |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF151 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Taxes