MN HF865 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance
Pending: House Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Product stewardship programs provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Product stewardship programs provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-21HouseCommittee report, to pass and re-refer to Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Finance
2013-03-20HouseCommittee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy
2013-03-13HouseMotion prevailed
2013-03-13HouseMotion to re-refer Civil Law
2013-03-13HouseSecond reading
2013-03-13HouseCommittee report, to pass as amended
2013-03-06HouseCommittee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2013-02-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback