MN HF842 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Author added Lueck
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Author added Lueck
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public school security audits funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Public school security audits funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] |
Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Lueck |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Runbeck |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF12 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy