MN HF803 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-21 - Author added Greenman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-21 - Author added Greenman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Indemnification agreement requirements modified and clarified.
Title
Indemnification agreement requirements modified and clarified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-21 | House | Author added Greenman |
2022-05-16 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2022-05-11 | House | Author added Mekeland |
2022-05-09 | House | Author added Koegel |
2022-04-21 | House | Authors added Vang, Sandstede, and Ecklund |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Huot |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1025 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Author added Johnson Stewart