MN HF8 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Firearm transfer criminal background checks required, and transferee permit disqualification grounds modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearm transfer criminal background checks required, and transferee permit disqualification grounds modified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House: Passage (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2020-03-02SenateIntroduction and first reading
2020-03-02SenateReceived from House
2020-02-27HouseBill was passed
2020-02-27HouseThird reading
2020-02-27HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken Multiple points of order raised
2020-02-27HouseAmendments offered
2020-02-26HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 27, 2020
2020-02-24HouseSecond reading
2020-02-24HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-06HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-27HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-01-10HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF3426 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback