MN HF79 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Author added Feist
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Author added Feist
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Food packaging chemical use regulated, rulemaking required, and money appropriated.
Title
Food packaging chemical use regulated, rulemaking required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-04-27 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Long |
2021-04-06 | House | Authors added Xiong, J., and Pryor |
2021-03-23 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Lee |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Vang |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Elkins |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Hassan and Frazier |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2021-02-11 | House | Author added Schultz |
2021-02-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-01-28 | House | Authors added Acomb, Hollins, and Christensen |
2021-01-25 | House | Author added Pinto |
2021-01-21 | House | Authors added Fischer, Freiberg, Lippert, Jordan, Ecklund, Huot, Bierman, and Morrison |
2021-01-19 | House | Author added Franke |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF70 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Author added Fateh