MN HF762 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Bahner
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Bahner
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer of funds from contract recovery fund prohibited outside of stated purpose.
Title
Transfer of funds from contract recovery fund prohibited outside of stated purpose.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Bahner |
2021-03-18 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-02-08 | House | Author added Nash |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF419 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - Second reading