MN HF670 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Construction materials purchased by certain contractors exemption provisions modified, and refund provision added.
Title
Construction materials purchased by certain contractors exemption provisions modified, and refund provision added.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF901 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Author added Little